THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:10:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-3084
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
Casey House Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elise Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hall (CPSO#: 90582 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-3084
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
Casey House Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elise Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hall (CPSO#: 90582 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELISE HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELISE HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009