THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:09:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4200 Fairview Street
Unit B1-B
Clinic
Burlington Ontario L7L 4Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-632-0462
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 14 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Mar 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaitlin Link Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Link (CPSO#: 90598 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 4200 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7L 4Y8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4200 Fairview Street
Unit B1-B
Clinic
Burlington Ontario L7L 4Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-632-0462
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 14 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Mar 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaitlin Link Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Link (CPSO#: 90598 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 4200 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7L 4Y8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAITLIN LINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAITLIN LINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009