THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:20:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)494 -2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brooks Fallis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fallis (CPSO#: 90610 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)494 -2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brooks Fallis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fallis (CPSO#: 90610 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BROOKS ALEXANDER FALLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALLIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BROOKS ALEXANDER FALLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALLIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009