THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:30:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 381 Church Street, Markham
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga Ontario L5K 2L3
Phone: 1-877-564-5227
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Samuel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Samuel (CPSO#: 90636 )
Business Address: 109-55 Town Centre Crt
Clinic
109
Scarborough ON M1P 4X4
Business Address: 101-50 Minthorn Boulevard
Markham Ontario L3T 7X8
(877) 564-5227
Business Address: 1310 Don Mills Road
North York Ontario M3B 2W6
(905) 855-1860
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000
Business Address: 100 Consilium Place
Unit 201
Toronto Ontario M1H 3E3
905) 855-1860

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 381 Church Street, Markham
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga Ontario L5K 2L3
Phone: 1-877-564-5227
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Samuel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Samuel (CPSO#: 90636 )
Business Address: 109-55 Town Centre Crt
Clinic
109
Scarborough ON M1P 4X4
Business Address: 101-50 Minthorn Boulevard
Markham Ontario L3T 7X8
(877) 564-5227
Business Address: 1310 Don Mills Road
North York Ontario M3B 2W6
(905) 855-1860
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000
Business Address: 100 Consilium Place
Unit 201
Toronto Ontario M1H 3E3
905) 855-1860

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER VARUGHESE SAMUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMUEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER VARUGHESE SAMUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMUEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009