THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:55:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: Dahl, Lisa Michelle (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Dahl, Lisa Michelle (Used Until: 01 Sep 2009)
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Center
Emergency Department
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Extension: 4500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1715 Seymour Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 8G4
Phone: 705-474-5750
Extension: 55533
Fax: 705-474-7712

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Harman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Harman (CPSO#: 90674 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
Emergency Department
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1A 0A4
(705) 474-8600 Extn: 4500

General Information

Former Name: Dahl, Lisa Michelle (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Dahl, Lisa Michelle (Used Until: 01 Sep 2009)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Center
Emergency Department
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Extension: 4500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1715 Seymour Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 8G4
Phone: 705-474-5750
Extension: 55533
Fax: 705-474-7712

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Harman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Harman (CPSO#: 90674 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
Emergency Department
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1A 0A4
(705) 474-8600 Extn: 4500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA MICHELLE HARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA MICHELLE HARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009