THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:18:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198225350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Remon Elyas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Elyas (CPSO#: 90679 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2

Corporation Name: Dr. Remon Elyas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198225350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Remon Elyas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Elyas (CPSO#: 90679 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2

Corporation Name: Dr. Remon Elyas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REMON GEORGE ELYAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELYAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REMON GEORGE ELYAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELYAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009