THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:56:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: Sillberg, Victoria Anne-Lii Hyatt (Used Until: 05 Aug 2009)
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria A.H. Mount Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mount (CPSO#: 90703 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 2 - 500 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K9

General Information

Former Name: Sillberg, Victoria Anne-Lii Hyatt (Used Until: 05 Aug 2009)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria A.H. Mount Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mount (CPSO#: 90703 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 2 - 500 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA ANNE-LII HYATT MOUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUNT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA ANNE-LII HYATT MOUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUNT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009