THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:57:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tanta University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Front Avenue W
Brockville Ontario K6V 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 342-2262
Extension: 5362
Fax: (613) 342-2435
Address: 75 Charles St
Brockville General Hospital
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5645
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5-5511 Manotick Main Street
Manotick ON K4M 0E2
Phone: (343) 474-0167
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 555 King St W
Prescott Family Health Team
Prescott ON K0E 1T0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moustafa Eid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Eid (CPSO#: 90712 )
Business Address: 420 Kilspindie Ridge

Corporation Name: Moustafa Eid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 May 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Tanta University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Front Avenue W
Brockville Ontario K6V 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 342-2262
Extension: 5362
Fax: (613) 342-2435
Address: 75 Charles St
Brockville General Hospital
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5645
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5-5511 Manotick Main Street
Manotick ON K4M 0E2
Phone: (343) 474-0167
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 555 King St W
Prescott Family Health Team
Prescott ON K0E 1T0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moustafa Eid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Eid (CPSO#: 90712 )
Business Address: 420 Kilspindie Ridge

Corporation Name: Moustafa Eid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 May 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOUSTAFA REYAD IBRAHIM EID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOUSTAFA REYAD IBRAHIM EID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tanta University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009