THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:11:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue, H432
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6948
Fax: (416) 840-4243
Address: 1805 Queen St East
Toronto Ontario M4L 3Y3
Phone: (416) 691-2030
Fax: (416) 259-7975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmed Kayssi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kayssi (CPSO#: 90725 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
H287
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6948

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue, H432
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6948
Fax: (416) 840-4243
Address: 1805 Queen St East
Toronto Ontario M4L 3Y3
Phone: (416) 691-2030
Fax: (416) 259-7975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmed Kayssi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kayssi (CPSO#: 90725 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
H287
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6948

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED KAYSSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAYSSI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED KAYSSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAYSSI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009