THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:44:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Disera Drive, Unit 100
Thornhill ON L4J 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057717755
Fax: 9057717752

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jan 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Irene Hwang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Hwang (CPSO#: 90738 )
Business Address: Suite 210
31 Disera Drive
Thornhill Ontario L4J 0A7
(905) 771-7755
Business Address: 30 Disera Drive, Unit 100
31 Disera Drive, Unit 100
Thornhill ON L4J0A7
9057717755

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Disera Drive, Unit 100
Thornhill ON L4J 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057717755
Fax: 9057717752

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jan 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Irene Hwang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Hwang (CPSO#: 90738 )
Business Address: Suite 210
31 Disera Drive
Thornhill Ontario L4J 0A7
(905) 771-7755
Business Address: 30 Disera Drive, Unit 100
31 Disera Drive, Unit 100
Thornhill ON L4J0A7
9057717755

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRENE I LAN HWANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HWANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRENE I LAN HWANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HWANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009