THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:55:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences Centre, Room 2R104
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main Street W
Hamilton, ON L8S4K1
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)521-2100
Extension: 75155
Fax: 905-570-8992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 05 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Sze-Chuck Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leung (CPSO#: 90741 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
1280 Main Street West
Room 2N491
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4K1
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences Centre, Room 2R104
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main Street W
Hamilton, ON L8S4K1
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)521-2100
Extension: 75155
Fax: 905-570-8992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 05 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Sze-Chuck Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leung (CPSO#: 90741 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
1280 Main Street West
Room 2N491
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4K1
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES SZE-CHUCK LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES SZE-CHUCK LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009