THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:10:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Catharines General Hospital
Emergency Department
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Riddle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Riddle (CPSO#: 90753 )
Business Address: St. Catharines General Hospital
Emergency Department
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4947

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Catharines General Hospital
Emergency Department
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Riddle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Riddle (CPSO#: 90753 )
Business Address: St. Catharines General Hospital
Emergency Department
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4947

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER RIDDLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIDDLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER RIDDLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIDDLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009