THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 08:22:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139384240
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20260 County Rd 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C1A0
Phone: (613) 932-9494
Fax: (613) 932-0265
Address: Unit 109 - 705 Cotton Mill St.
Cornwall Ontario K6H 7K7
Phone: (613) 932-9494
Fax: (613) 932-0265

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Priti Sharda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sharda (CPSO#: 101850 ) Dr. R. Sharda (CPSO#: 90795 )
Business Address: Unit 109
705 Cotton Mill Street
Cornwall Ontario K6H 7K7
(613) 932-9494

Corporation Name: R. K. Sharda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sharda (CPSO#: 90795 )
Business Address: Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Address: 109 - 705 Cotton Mill Street
Cornwall Ontario K6H 7K7
(613) 932-9494

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139384240
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20260 County Rd 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C1A0
Phone: (613) 932-9494
Fax: (613) 932-0265
Address: Unit 109 - 705 Cotton Mill St.
Cornwall Ontario K6H 7K7
Phone: (613) 932-9494
Fax: (613) 932-0265

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Priti Sharda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sharda (CPSO#: 101850 ) Dr. R. Sharda (CPSO#: 90795 )
Business Address: Unit 109
705 Cotton Mill Street
Cornwall Ontario K6H 7K7
(613) 932-9494

Corporation Name: R. K. Sharda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sharda (CPSO#: 90795 )
Business Address: Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Address: 109 - 705 Cotton Mill Street
Cornwall Ontario K6H 7K7
(613) 932-9494

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJAN KUMAR SHARDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJAN KUMAR SHARDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jul 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2009