THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:10:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-277-4000
Fax: 905-277-4012

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Harith Abbas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abbas (CPSO#: 90802 )
Business Address: 1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 1E3
(905) 306-1200
Business Address: Trillium Health Center
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Department of Surgery
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

Corporation Name: Harith Abbas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jun 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-277-4000
Fax: 905-277-4012

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Harith Abbas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abbas (CPSO#: 90802 )
Business Address: 1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 1E3
(905) 306-1200
Business Address: Trillium Health Center
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Department of Surgery
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

Corporation Name: Harith Abbas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jun 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARITH ABDULKHITHER ABBAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARITH ABDULKHITHER ABBAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009