THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:15:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CK Cardiac Imaging Centre
#1-180 McNaughton Ave West
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-6440
Fax: (519) 397-3061

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H Van Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Van (CPSO#: 90803 )
Business Address: CK Cardiac Imaging Centre
180 McNaughton Avenue West
Suite 1
Chatham Ontario N7L 4Z7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CK Cardiac Imaging Centre
#1-180 McNaughton Ave West
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-6440
Fax: (519) 397-3061

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H Van Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Van (CPSO#: 90803 )
Business Address: CK Cardiac Imaging Centre
180 McNaughton Avenue West
Suite 1
Chatham Ontario N7L 4Z7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOA NGOC TUAN VAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOA NGOC TUAN VAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009