THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:13:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-270-3385
Fax: 905-270-8030

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adriana E. Mechetiuc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mechetiuc (CPSO#: 90810 )
Business Address: 101 Queensway West
Unit 100
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 270-3385

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-270-3385
Fax: 905-270-8030

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adriana E. Mechetiuc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mechetiuc (CPSO#: 90810 )
Business Address: 101 Queensway West
Unit 100
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 270-3385

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA ELENA MECHETIUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MECHETIUC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA ELENA MECHETIUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MECHETIUC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009