THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:22:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South East Family Health Team
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 699-7775
Fax: 416-699-7766
Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberley Kitto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kitto (CPSO#: 90820 )
Business Address: South East Family Health Team
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1J3
(416) 699-7775
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 461-8272

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South East Family Health Team
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 699-7775
Fax: 416-699-7766
Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberley Kitto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kitto (CPSO#: 90820 )
Business Address: South East Family Health Team
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1J3
(416) 699-7775
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 461-8272

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY ANN KITTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KITTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY ANN KITTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KITTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009