THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:03:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 University Ave
Suite 3-902
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)5863195
Fax: (416)5865223

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Eva Kfouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kfouri (CPSO#: 90841 )
Business Address: 700 University Avenue
Suite 3-902
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 318-2264

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 University Ave
Suite 3-902
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)5863195
Fax: (416)5865223

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Eva Kfouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kfouri (CPSO#: 90841 )
Business Address: 700 University Avenue
Suite 3-902
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 318-2264

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA EVA KFOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KFOURI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA EVA KFOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KFOURI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009