THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:28:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6SE - Critical Care Unit
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (647) 362-9618

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elliott Owen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Owen (CPSO#: 90849 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovarid Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6SE - Critical Care Unit
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (647) 362-9618

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elliott Owen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Owen (CPSO#: 90849 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovarid Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLIOTT OWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLIOTT OWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009