THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: Norrad, Rebecca Sunny (Used Until: 07 Dec 2011)
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306-180 Vine St S
Suite 306
St. Catharines ON L2R 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052280402
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pratt (CPSO#: 90853 )
Business Address: 180 Vine Street South
St Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3
(905) 662-3303

General Information

Former Name: Norrad, Rebecca Sunny (Used Until: 07 Dec 2011)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306-180 Vine St S
Suite 306
St. Catharines ON L2R 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052280402
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pratt (CPSO#: 90853 )
Business Address: 180 Vine Street South
St Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3
(905) 662-3303

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA SUNNY PRATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRATT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA SUNNY PRATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRATT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009