THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:07:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 353 St Paul Ave UNIT 206A
Brantford ON N3R 4N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193047003
Fax: 5193048007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 06 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Suraj Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma (CPSO#: 90870 )
Business Address: 224 - 214 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
(519) 304-7003
Business Address: 206A-353 St Paul Ave
Brantford ON N3R 4N3
5193047003

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 353 St Paul Ave UNIT 206A
Brantford ON N3R 4N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193047003
Fax: 5193048007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 06 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Suraj Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma (CPSO#: 90870 )
Business Address: 224 - 214 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
(519) 304-7003
Business Address: 206A-353 St Paul Ave
Brantford ON N3R 4N3
5193047003

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SURAJ ASHOK SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SURAJ ASHOK SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009