THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:19:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Hawler Medical University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KURDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Cardiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z Jaff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Jaff (CPSO#: 90885 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Cardiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KURDI
Medical School: Hawler Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Cardiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z Jaff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Jaff (CPSO#: 90885 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Cardiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZARDASHT HASAN JAFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZARDASHT HASAN JAFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hawler Medical University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Apr 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009