THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 02:06:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Anesthesia and Perioperative
Medicine, Western University
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road Room C3 108
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 55115
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 26 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Vergel de Dios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vergel de Dios (CPSO#: 90900 )
Business Address: Western University-University Hospital
Anesthesia and Perioperative Medicine
Room C3-108
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 55115

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Anesthesia and Perioperative
Medicine, Western University
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road Room C3 108
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 55115
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 26 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Vergel de Dios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vergel de Dios (CPSO#: 90900 )
Business Address: Western University-University Hospital
Anesthesia and Perioperative Medicine
Room C3-108
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 55115

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN VERGEL DE DIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERGEL DE DIOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN VERGEL DE DIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERGEL DE DIOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009