On February 13, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Yaghini committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practise of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
Dr. Yaghini is a family doctor who currently provides locum services to emergency departments in various hospitals in Ontario.
At the relevant time, Dr. Yaghini practised in association with a group of physicians in a Family Health Group (the “Group”), in Thornbury, Ontario. The Group was composed of a number of physicians, including Dr. X and Dr. Yaghini. At the relevant time, Dr. Yaghini also had privileges at the Grey Bruce Health Services, (“the hospital”). Dr. Yaghini had access to the hospital’s electronic medical records system (“EMR”). Personal medical records pertaining to Dr. X were stored in the hospital’s EMR.
In the period preceding the events at issue in this hearing, the personal and professional relationship between Dr. X and Dr. Yaghini had deteriorated and become very poor. On September 17, 2014, the Chief of Staff of the hospital contacted the College to advise that the hospital had determined that Dr. Yaghini had accessed Dr. X’s personal health records through the hospital’s EMR, on June 9, 2013. The access by Dr. Yaghini was in breach of the hospital’s policy on access to personal health information. Dr. Yaghini was not authorized to view Dr. X’s personal health records.
Dr. Yaghini acknowledged that he had no justification for viewing the personal health records of Dr. X. Effective November 29, 2014, Dr. Yaghini agreed to voluntarily resign his privileges at the hospital at the request of the Chief of Staff.
Dr. Yaghini’s explanation for viewing the personal health records of Dr. X is that, in the context of their deteriorating relationship, Dr. Yaghini accessed the record because of his perception of ongoing bullying and harassing behaviour by Dr. X towards him. This perception caused Dr. Yaghini to be concerned about his well-being and to question whether Dr. X might have a health issue that was motivating Dr. X’s behaviour towards him. For this reason, Dr. Yaghini decided to access Dr. X’s personal health records.
On January 29, 2015, Dr. Yaghini completed a course titled, “Patient confidentiality and disclosing information”.
Disposition
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Yaghini’s Certificate of Registration for a three (3) month period effective April 2, 2017 at midnight (12:00 a.m.).
- the Registrar to impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Yaghini’s certificate of registration:
(i) At his own expense, Dr. Yaghini shall participate in and successfully complete, within six (6) months of the date of this Order, individualized instruction in medical ethics satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the College. The instructor shall provide a summative report to the College including his or her conclusion about whether the instruction was completed successfully by Dr. Yaghini.
- Dr. Yaghini appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Yaghini to pay costs to the College for a one day hearing in the amount of $5,000.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.