THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 19:12:08 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: New Vision Family Health Team
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanna Zorzitto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zorzitto (CPSO#: 90922 )
Business Address: New Vision Family Health Team
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
(519) 578-3510

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: New Vision Family Health Team
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanna Zorzitto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zorzitto (CPSO#: 90922 )
Business Address: New Vision Family Health Team
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
(519) 578-3510

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA ZORZITTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZORZITTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA ZORZITTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZORZITTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009