THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:48:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2360 Yonge St
Pollin Fertility
2nd Floor
Toronto ON M4P 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-342-3552
Fax: 437-702-0876

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evan Taerk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Taerk (CPSO#: 90932 )
Business Address: 2360 Yonge St
Pollin Fertility
2nd floor
Toronto ON M4P 0E2
4163423552
Business Address: 15 Bracondale Hill Rd
Toronto ON M6G 3P3
4167372033

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2360 Yonge St
Pollin Fertility
2nd Floor
Toronto ON M4P 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-342-3552
Fax: 437-702-0876

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evan Taerk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Taerk (CPSO#: 90932 )
Business Address: 2360 Yonge St
Pollin Fertility
2nd floor
Toronto ON M4P 0E2
4163423552
Business Address: 15 Bracondale Hill Rd
Toronto ON M6G 3P3
4167372033

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVAN TAERK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAERK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVAN TAERK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAERK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009