THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:45:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165306000
Extension: 3869
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301-755 Queensway E
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5
Phone: (905) 279-3533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Woodley-Cook Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Woodley-Cook (CPSO#: 90936 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
4165306000 Extn: 3869
Business Address: 755 Queensway E
Suite 301
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5

Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165306000
Extension: 3869
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301-755 Queensway E
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5
Phone: (905) 279-3533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Woodley-Cook Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Woodley-Cook (CPSO#: 90936 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
4165306000 Extn: 3869
Business Address: 755 Queensway E
Suite 301
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5

Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL GREGORY ARON WOODLEY-COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODLEY-COOK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL GREGORY ARON WOODLEY-COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODLEY-COOK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009