THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 12:25:09 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Main Street Medical Centre
10886 Hurontario Street North
Suite 9
Brampton Ontario L7A 3R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 846-9911
Fax: (905) 846-9299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ravjit Ahluwalia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ahluwalia (CPSO#: 90939 )
Business Address: 10886 Hurontario Street
Suite 9
Brampton Ontario L7A 3R9
(905) 846-9911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Main Street Medical Centre
10886 Hurontario Street North
Suite 9
Brampton Ontario L7A 3R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 846-9911
Fax: (905) 846-9299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ravjit Ahluwalia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ahluwalia (CPSO#: 90939 )
Business Address: 10886 Hurontario Street
Suite 9
Brampton Ontario L7A 3R9
(905) 846-9911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVJIT SINGH AHLUWALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHLUWALIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVJIT SINGH AHLUWALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHLUWALIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009