THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:35:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 311 O'Connor Street
Ottawa Ontario K2P 2G9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (613) 235-8346
Fax: (613) 235-8347

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shawn Amyot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amyot (CPSO#: 90941 )
Business Address: 311 O'Connor Street
Ottawa Ontario K2P 2G9
(613) 235-8346

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 311 O'Connor Street
Ottawa Ontario K2P 2G9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (613) 235-8346
Fax: (613) 235-8347

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shawn Amyot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amyot (CPSO#: 90941 )
Business Address: 311 O'Connor Street
Ottawa Ontario K2P 2G9
(613) 235-8346

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAWN RICHARD AMYOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMYOT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAWN RICHARD AMYOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMYOT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009