THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:20:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: Arnold Gomes, Megan Melissa (Used Until: 14 Mar 2016)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-1355 Bank St
Ottawa, ON
K1H 8K7
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2907
Fax: 6135186555
Address: The Riverside Hospital
1967 Riverside Drive Box 503
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: 613-798-5555
Fax: 613-739-6984

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Megan Gomes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gomes (CPSO#: 90945 )
Business Address: 205 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 721-2907

General Information

Former Name: Arnold Gomes, Megan Melissa (Used Until: 14 Mar 2016)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-1355 Bank St
Ottawa, ON
K1H 8K7
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2907
Fax: 6135186555
Address: The Riverside Hospital
1967 Riverside Drive Box 503
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: 613-798-5555
Fax: 613-739-6984

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Megan Gomes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gomes (CPSO#: 90945 )
Business Address: 205 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 721-2907

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGAN MELISSA GOMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGAN MELISSA GOMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009