THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:43:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 444 boulevard de l'Hopital
suite 220
Gatineau Québec J8T 7X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 819-303-1059
Fax: 8195686508
Address: 75 Spring street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 909 boulevard de la Vérendrye Ouest
Gatineau Quebec J8P 7H2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 155 Rue Maclaren E
Gatineau QC J8L 0C2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valerie Bohemier Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bohemier (CPSO#: 90950 )
Business Address: 75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 444 boulevard de l'Hopital
suite 220
Gatineau Québec J8T 7X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 819-303-1059
Fax: 8195686508
Address: 75 Spring street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 909 boulevard de la Vérendrye Ouest
Gatineau Quebec J8P 7H2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 155 Rue Maclaren E
Gatineau QC J8L 0C2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valerie Bohemier Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bohemier (CPSO#: 90950 )
Business Address: 75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALERIE RENELLE MARIE BOHEMIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOHEMIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALERIE RENELLE MARIE BOHEMIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOHEMIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009