THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:33:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: BOX 59065 1559 Alta Vista Dr
Ottawa Ontario K1G 5T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-518-4008
Fax: 343-888-2626

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Brodeur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Brodeur (CPSO#: 90953 )
Business Address: 1559 Alta Vista Dr
Box 59065
Ottawa ON K1G 5T7
613-518-4008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: BOX 59065 1559 Alta Vista Dr
Ottawa Ontario K1G 5T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-518-4008
Fax: 343-888-2626

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Brodeur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Brodeur (CPSO#: 90953 )
Business Address: 1559 Alta Vista Dr
Box 59065
Ottawa ON K1G 5T7
613-518-4008

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER FRANCES BRODEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRODEUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER FRANCES BRODEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRODEUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009