THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:04:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 9999 Stn Main
Mental Health Services
2 Field Ambulance Medical Clinic
258 Somme road building N-111
Petawawa ON K8H 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136875511
Extension: 242-4100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: ACT Kingston
62 Division St
Kingston Ontario K7L3M6
Phone: (613) 544-0228
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Phone: 6137212000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke Regional Hosptial
Department of Psychiatry
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. Chuhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chuhan (CPSO#: 90957 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
(613) 732-2811

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 9999 Stn Main
Mental Health Services
2 Field Ambulance Medical Clinic
258 Somme road building N-111
Petawawa ON K8H 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136875511
Extension: 242-4100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: ACT Kingston
62 Division St
Kingston Ontario K7L3M6
Phone: (613) 544-0228
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Phone: 6137212000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke Regional Hosptial
Department of Psychiatry
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. Chuhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chuhan (CPSO#: 90957 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
(613) 732-2811

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YADWINDER SINGH CHUHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YADWINDER SINGH CHUHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009