THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:56:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Division of Radiation Oncology
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 110 McCurdy Dr
Kanata ON K2L 2Z6
Phone: 613 591-6002
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: REENA GOINDI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goindi (CPSO#: 90962 )
Business Address: 110 McCurdy Dr
Kanata ON K2L 2Z6
613-591-6002
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
613-737-7700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Division of Radiation Oncology
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 110 McCurdy Dr
Kanata ON K2L 2Z6
Phone: 613 591-6002
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: REENA GOINDI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goindi (CPSO#: 90962 )
Business Address: 110 McCurdy Dr
Kanata ON K2L 2Z6
613-591-6002
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
613-737-7700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REENA GOINDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOINDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REENA GOINDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOINDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009