THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 16:16:25 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 31 Aug 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Francois Leduc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fundamenski (CPSO#: 82490 ) Dr. F. Leduc (CPSO#: 90974 )
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Corporation Name: M. Fundamenski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fundamenski (CPSO#: 82490 ) Dr. F. Leduc (CPSO#: 90974 )
Business Address: Suite 400
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
(613) 695-6900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 31 Aug 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Francois Leduc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fundamenski (CPSO#: 82490 ) Dr. F. Leduc (CPSO#: 90974 )
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Corporation Name: M. Fundamenski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fundamenski (CPSO#: 82490 ) Dr. F. Leduc (CPSO#: 90974 )
Business Address: Suite 400
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
(613) 695-6900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCOIS JACQUES LEDUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDUC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCOIS JACQUES LEDUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDUC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009