THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:09:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street, 3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-323-7559
Extension: 6
Fax: 416-323-7739
Address: 1000 Queen Street East
Kickstart Medical
Toronto Ontario M4M 1K1
Phone: (416) 466-2694
Fax: (416) 466-0403
Address: 117 The Esplanade
Toronto Public Health
Toronto Ontario M5E
Phone: 416 392 0520
Fax: 416 392 0810

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street, 3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-323-7559
Extension: 6
Fax: 416-323-7739
Address: 1000 Queen Street East
Kickstart Medical
Toronto Ontario M4M 1K1
Phone: (416) 466-2694
Fax: (416) 466-0403
Address: 117 The Esplanade
Toronto Public Health
Toronto Ontario M5E
Phone: 416 392 0520
Fax: 416 392 0810

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA NADINE LEECE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEECE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA NADINE LEECE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEECE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009