THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 19:32:34 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 400 Mckeown Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 495-8115
Fax: (705) 495-8114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 19 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katharine J. Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nicholson (CPSO#: 90983 )
Business Address: 400 Mckeown Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2
(705) 495-8115
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 400 Mckeown Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 495-8115
Fax: (705) 495-8114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 19 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katharine J. Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nicholson (CPSO#: 90983 )
Business Address: 400 Mckeown Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2
(705) 495-8115
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHARINE JILL NICHOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHARINE JILL NICHOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009