THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 19:04:13 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Josephs Health Care Hamilton
Department of Critical Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-9017
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Critical Care
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Inouye & Petrosoniak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Inouye (CPSO#: 90967 ) Dr. A. Petrosoniak (CPSO#: 90994 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
4th Floor, Room 436
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 44697
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 1-008E Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5976
Business Address: St Josephs Health Care Hamilton
Department of Critical Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-9017
Business Address: Suite 302
1835 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1X8
(416) 480-9779

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Josephs Health Care Hamilton
Department of Critical Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-9017
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Critical Care
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Inouye & Petrosoniak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Inouye (CPSO#: 90967 ) Dr. A. Petrosoniak (CPSO#: 90994 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
4th Floor, Room 436
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 44697
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 1-008E Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5976
Business Address: St Josephs Health Care Hamilton
Department of Critical Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-9017
Business Address: Suite 302
1835 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1X8
(416) 480-9779

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW MARK PETROSONIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETROSONIAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW MARK PETROSONIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETROSONIAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009