THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:26:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 Montreal Rd
Orthopedic Surgeons
Suite 12
Ottawa ON K1K 4K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-746-6745
Fax: 613-746-6008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marie-France Rancourt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rancourt (CPSO#: 91000 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: 595 Montreal Road
Suite 202
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
(613) 746-6745
Business Address: 12-585 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 4K4
613-746-6745

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 Montreal Rd
Orthopedic Surgeons
Suite 12
Ottawa ON K1K 4K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-746-6745
Fax: 613-746-6008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marie-France Rancourt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rancourt (CPSO#: 91000 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: 595 Montreal Road
Suite 202
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
(613) 746-6745
Business Address: 12-585 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 4K4
613-746-6745

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE-FRANCE RANCOURT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANCOURT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE-FRANCE RANCOURT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANCOURT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009