THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:36:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 32 Centennial Dr
Seaforth Ontario N0K 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 600-2273
Fax: (519) 600-2501

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Stewart (CPSO#: 91018 )
Business Address: 32 Centennial Drive
Seaforth Ontario N0K 1W0
(519) 600-2273

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 32 Centennial Dr
Seaforth Ontario N0K 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 600-2273
Fax: (519) 600-2501

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Stewart (CPSO#: 91018 )
Business Address: 32 Centennial Drive
Seaforth Ontario N0K 1W0
(519) 600-2273

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY ERIC STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY ERIC STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009