THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:12:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C4-211C
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-663-3165
Fax: 519-663-3858

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 06 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anouar Teriaky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Teriaky (CPSO#: 91021 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 33165

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C4-211C
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-663-3165
Fax: 519-663-3858

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 06 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anouar Teriaky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Teriaky (CPSO#: 91021 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 33165

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANOUAR TERIAKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERIAKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANOUAR TERIAKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERIAKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009