THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:05:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
4-146CC
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168646060
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Ailon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ailon (CPSO#: 91029 )
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
4-146 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
4-146CC
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168646060
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Ailon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ailon (CPSO#: 91029 )
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
4-146 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN ISAAC AILON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AILON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN ISAAC AILON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AILON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009