THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 19:28:55 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Suite 8EN
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4825
Fax: (416) 340-4198

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Josee Lynch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lynch (CPSO#: 91042 )
Business Address: UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Suite 8EN-231
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4825

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Suite 8EN
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4825
Fax: (416) 340-4198

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Josee Lynch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lynch (CPSO#: 91042 )
Business Address: UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Suite 8EN-231
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4825

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE-JOSEE ALBERT LYNCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYNCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE-JOSEE ALBERT LYNCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYNCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009