THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:59:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Christian Medical College, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104
311 Commericial Street
Milton Ontario L9T 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 875-1300
Fax: (905) 875-0367

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Bhatia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhatia (CPSO#: 91049 )
Business Address: Suite 104
311 Commercial Street
Milton Ontario L9T 3Z9
(905) 875-1300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Christian Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104
311 Commericial Street
Milton Ontario L9T 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 875-1300
Fax: (905) 875-0367

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Bhatia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhatia (CPSO#: 91049 )
Business Address: Suite 104
311 Commercial Street
Milton Ontario L9T 3Z9
(905) 875-1300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANJAY BHATIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANJAY BHATIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Christian Medical College, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Dec 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009