THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:07:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cottage Country Family Health Team
5 Pineridge Gate
Gravenhurst Ontario P1P 1Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 687-2271
Fax: (705) 687-7575
Address: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L2E4
Phone: 705-645-4404
Fax: 705-645-4594
Address: Muskoka Shores Care Community
200 Kelly Drive
Gravenhurst Ontario P1P1P3
Phone: 705-687-3444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kimberley Forester Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Forester (CPSO#: 91072 )
Business Address: 1-305 Peter St
Gravenhurst ON P1P 1G5
7056411052

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cottage Country Family Health Team
5 Pineridge Gate
Gravenhurst Ontario P1P 1Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 687-2271
Fax: (705) 687-7575
Address: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L2E4
Phone: 705-645-4404
Fax: 705-645-4594
Address: Muskoka Shores Care Community
200 Kelly Drive
Gravenhurst Ontario P1P1P3
Phone: 705-687-3444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kimberley Forester Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Forester (CPSO#: 91072 )
Business Address: 1-305 Peter St
Gravenhurst ON P1P 1G5
7056411052

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ANN FORESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORESTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ANN FORESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORESTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009