THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:35:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dingwall Medical Group
40 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 223-2258
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Moir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moir (CPSO#: 91082 )
Business Address: Dingwall Medical Group
40 Goodall Street
Box 3011
Dryden Ontario P8N 3H8
(807) 220-2299

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dingwall Medical Group
40 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 223-2258
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Moir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moir (CPSO#: 91082 )
Business Address: Dingwall Medical Group
40 Goodall Street
Box 3011
Dryden Ontario P8N 3H8
(807) 220-2299

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM BLUE MOIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM BLUE MOIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009