THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 07:38:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 575-1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 277 Wilson Street East
Ancaster Ontario L9G 2B8
Phone: 9056287973
Fax: 9066282582

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Rochwerg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rochwerg (CPSO#: 91001 ) Dr. R. Loewith (CPSO#: 91144 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 575-1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 277 Wilson Street East
Ancaster Ontario L9G 2B8
Phone: 9056287973
Fax: 9066282582

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Rochwerg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rochwerg (CPSO#: 91001 ) Dr. R. Loewith (CPSO#: 91144 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL HANNAH LOEWITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOEWITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL HANNAH LOEWITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOEWITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009