THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 19:47:19 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055768711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Gorguy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Gorguy (CPSO#: 77164 ) Dr. N. Gorguy (CPSO#: 91158 )
Business Address: 301 - 4750 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 0J6
(416) 733-4535
Business Address: 600 - 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 208-7318

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055768711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Gorguy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Gorguy (CPSO#: 77164 ) Dr. N. Gorguy (CPSO#: 91158 )
Business Address: 301 - 4750 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 0J6
(416) 733-4535
Business Address: 600 - 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 208-7318

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NERMINE GORGUY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORGUY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NERMINE GORGUY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORGUY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009