THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:55:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 7K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 472-2646
Fax: (705) 476-6543

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Menezes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Menezes (CPSO#: 91160 )
Business Address: Suite 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 7K8
(705) 472-2646

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 7K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 472-2646
Fax: (705) 476-6543

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Menezes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Menezes (CPSO#: 91160 )
Business Address: Suite 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 7K8
(705) 472-2646

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMBER SUPRIYA MENEZES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENEZES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMBER SUPRIYA MENEZES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENEZES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009