THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/04/25 23:48:06 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Health Services Georgetown
c/o Department of Family Medicine
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-873-0111
Extension: 8232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
Phone: (905) 304-0062
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 6G3
Phone: (905) 790-9030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 32-1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Phone: 905-335-1888
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 207
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Phone: 905 631-2080
Fax: 905 635-6215
Address: 2227 South Millway #303
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R6
Phone: 905 569 7007
Fax: (905) 569-7056
Address: 2225 Erin Mills Parkway #183
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1T9
Phone: (905) 823-0223
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 202 - 710 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V7
Phone: (905) 607-0022
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5734 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2M4E7
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sukhjeen Nandra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nandra (CPSO#: 91161 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Health Services Georgetown
c/o Department of Family Medicine
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-873-0111
Extension: 8232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
Phone: (905) 304-0062
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 6G3
Phone: (905) 790-9030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 32-1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Phone: 905-335-1888
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 207
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Phone: 905 631-2080
Fax: 905 635-6215
Address: 2227 South Millway #303
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R6
Phone: 905 569 7007
Fax: (905) 569-7056
Address: 2225 Erin Mills Parkway #183
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1T9
Phone: (905) 823-0223
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 202 - 710 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V7
Phone: (905) 607-0022
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5734 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2M4E7
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sukhjeen Nandra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nandra (CPSO#: 91161 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUKHJEEN KAUR NANDRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANDRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUKHJEEN KAUR NANDRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANDRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009